Text: H.R.6687 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (09/26/2018)

 
[Congressional Bills 115th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 6687 Referred in Senate (RFS)]

<DOC>
115th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 6687


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           September 26, 2018

   Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and 
                           Natural Resources


_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
   To direct the Secretary of the Interior to manage the Point Reyes 
    National Seashore in the State of California consistently with 
Congress' long-standing intent to continue to authorize working dairies 
 and ranches on agricultural property as part of the seashore's unique 
 historic, cultural, scenic and natural values, and for other purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. MANAGEMENT OF AGRICULTURAL PROPERTY IN POINT REYES NATIONAL 
              SEASHORE.

    Public Law 87-657 (16 U.S.C. 459c, et seq.) is amended as follows:
            (1) In section 5(b) (16 U.S.C. 459c-5(b))--
                    (A) in the first sentence, by striking ``As used 
                in'' and inserting the following:
    ``(1) As used in'';
                    (B) by striking ``The term `agricultural property' 
                as used'' and inserting the following:
    ``(2) The term `agricultural property' as used'';
                    (C) by striking ``means lands which were in regular 
                use'' and inserting ``means--
            ``(A) lands under agricultural lease or permit as of 
        September 1, 2018, or lands that were in regular use''; and
                    (D) by striking the period at the end and inserting 
                ``; and
            ``(B) on the northern district of the Golden Gate National 
        Recreation Area, lands under agricultural lease or permit as of 
        September 1, 2018, or lands that were in regular use for, or 
        were being converted to, agricultural, ranching, or dairying 
        purposes as of May 1, 1978, together with residential and other 
        structures related to the above uses of the property that were 
        in existence or under construction as of May 1, 1978.''.
            (2) In section 5 (16 U.S.C. 459c-5)--
                    (A) by inserting before subsection (a) the 
                following:
    ``(a) The Secretary shall manage agricultural property consistent 
with Congress' long-standing intent that working dairies and ranches 
continue to be authorized to operate on agricultural property as part 
of the seashore's unique historic, cultural, scenic and natural 
values.''; and
                    (B) by redesignating subsequent subsections 
                accordingly.
            (3) In section 6 (16 U.S.C. 459c-6), by adding at the end 
        the following:
    ``(c)(1) In areas of agricultural property where Tule Elk present 
conflicts with working ranches or dairies, the Secretary shall manage 
the Tule Elk for separation from the working ranches or dairies. To 
minimize the conflicts and prevent establishment of new Tule Elk herds 
on agricultural property, the Secretary may work with Indian Tribes 
interested in the following:
            ``(A) Partnering with the Secretary in the relocation and 
        reestablishment of Tule Elk on Tribal lands.
            ``(B) Participating in hunting Tule Elk on a subsistence or 
        ceremonial basis.
            ``(C) Other partnerships and activities that the Secretary 
        determines are suitable and feasible for this purpose.
    ``(2) Nothing in this subsection reduces or diminishes the 
authority of the Secretary to use other existing authorities or 
management tools to separate Tule Elk from agricultural property.''.
            (4) By adding at the end, the following:
    ``Sec. 10.  Consistent with the purposes of this Act, including 
section 5(a), the Secretary is directed to complete, without delay, the 
General Management Plan Amendment for Point Reyes National Seashore and 
the northern district of Golden Gate National Recreation Area, its 
Environmental Impact Statement, and, upon completion of the Record of 
Decision, issue leases and special use permits of 20 years for working 
dairies and ranches on agricultural property. Nothing in this Act 
requires the Secretary to issue leases and special use permits of 20 
years in circumstances where there is no willing lessee, or to a 
previous lessee who has abandoned or discontinued ranching.''.

            Passed the House of Representatives September 25, 2018.

            Attest:

                                                 KAREN L. HAAS,

                                                                 Clerk.

Share This