There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Restricting First Use of Nuclear Weapons Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the conduct of a first-use nuclear strike absent a declaration of war by Congress.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/24/2017Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/30/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/30/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 01/30/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 01/30/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/07/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/07/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/07/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 02/14/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/14/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/14/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/16/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/27/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/01/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 03/17/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/21/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/29/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/03/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/12/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 04/24/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/25/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/25/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/01/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/03/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 05/11/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/26/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/02/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/08/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/26/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/06/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/17/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/11/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 08/11/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/11/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/11/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/15/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/15/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/15/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/18/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 08/18/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 08/18/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 08/29/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/06/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/18/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/02/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/04/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/06/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/10/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/16/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/16/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 10/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/23/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/23/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/23/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/31/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 10/31/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/31/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/31/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/31/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/31/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/09/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/05/2018
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/05/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/09/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/29/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/20/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/20/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/18/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/23/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/24/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.669. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2017)

Restricting First Use of Nuclear Weapons Act of 2017

This bill prohibits the President from using the Armed Forces to conduct a first-use nuclear strike unless such strike is conducted pursuant to a congressional declaration of war expressly authorizing such strike.

"First-use nuclear strike" means a nuclear weapons attack against an enemy that is conducted without the President determining that the enemy has first launched a nuclear strike against the United States or a U.S. ally.