There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Community Safety and Security Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Community Safety and Security Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to clarify the definition of "crime of violence", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/07/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 247 - 152, 2 Present (Roll no. 393).(text: CR H7925-7926)
08/31/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
09/12/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/07/2018-10:51amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/07/2018-10:51amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 247 - 152, 2 Present (Roll no. 393). (text: CR H7925-7926)
09/07/2018-10:18amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
09/07/2018-9:18amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6691.
09/07/2018-9:17amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 6691 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. Section 2 provides that at any time on the legislative day of September 13, 2018, it shall be in order for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules as though under clause 1 of rule XV.
09/07/2018-9:17amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1051. (consideration: CR H7925-7937)
09/06/2018-1:36pmHouseRule H. Res. 1051 passed House.
09/05/2018-6:03pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1051 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6691 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. Section 2 provides that at any time on the legislative day of September 13, 2018, it shall be in order for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules as though under clause 1 of rule XV.
08/31/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/31/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
08/31/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary08/31/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations08/31/2018 Referred to
Senate Judiciary09/12/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.