There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Combating European Anti-Semitism Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Combating European Anti-Semitism Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Combating European Anti-Semitism Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require continued and enhanced annual reporting to Congress in the Annual Report on International Religious Freedom on anti-Semitic incidents in Europe, the safety and security of European Jewish communities, and the efforts of the United States to partner with European governments, the European Union, and civil society groups, to combat anti-Semitism, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-434.
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2018Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8041)
05/17/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4275-4276)
01/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-434.
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019HousePresented to President.
12/22/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2018SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8041)
05/18/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
05/17/2017-4:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/17/2017-4:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4275-4276)
05/17/2017-4:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 672.
05/17/2017-4:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4275-4278)
05/17/2017-4:19pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/29/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/29/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/24/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/24/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (34)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/24/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations02/16/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats02/16/2017 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations05/18/2017 Referred to
12/22/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.672. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-434 (01/14/2019)

Combating European Anti-Semitism Act of 2017

This bill requires the Department of State to include in its Annual Report on International Religious Freedom information about each European country where there have been particularly significant threats or attacks against Jewish persons or institutions. The report shall include information about the security needs of such Jewish communities, U.S. efforts to partner with European law enforcement agencies and civil society groups, European public awareness initiatives to promote pluralism and tolerance, and efforts by European governments to adopt and apply a working definition of anti-Semitism.