There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protect Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protect Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Economic Growth, Regulatory Relief, and Consumer Protection Act to clarify seasoning requirements for certain refinanced mortgage loans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9064)
09/26/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-983.
09/07/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/02/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
09/27/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/26/2018-6:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2018-6:27pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9064)
09/26/2018-6:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6737.
09/26/2018-6:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9064-9065)
09/26/2018-6:20pmHouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/26/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 768.
09/26/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-983.
09/13/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0.
09/13/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/07/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
09/07/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 09/10/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/12/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/13/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services09/07/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Markup by
09/26/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-983
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs10/02/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6737. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/2018)

Protect Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Housing Act to repeal waiting period requirements for guarantees provided by the Government National Mortgage Association (Ginnie Mae). Specifically, Ginnie Mae may guarantee a security backed by a refinanced Department of Veterans Affairs housing loan without a waiting period.