There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (10)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

SUCCESS Act
Study of Underrepresented Classes Chasing Engineering and Science Success Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SUCCESS Act
Study of Underrepresented Classes Chasing Engineering and Science Success Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

SUCCESS Act
Study of Underrepresented Classes Chasing Engineering and Science Success Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

SUCCESS Act
Study of Underrepresented Classes Chasing Engineering and Science Success Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To direct the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, in consultation with the Administrator of the Small Business Administration, to study and provide recommendations to promote the participation of women, minorities, and veterans in entrepreneurship activities and the patent system, to extend by 8 years the Patent and Trademark Office's authority to set the amounts for the fees it charges, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, in consultation with the Administrator of the Small Business Administration, to study and provide recommendations to promote the participation of women and minorities in entrepreneurship activities and the patent system, to extend by 8 years the Patent and Trademark Office's authority to set the amounts for the fees it charges, and for other purposess.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-273. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/2018Signed by President.
10/24/2018Presented to President.
10/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6876)
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8815)
09/25/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-966.
09/10/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
10/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-273. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/2018Signed by President.
10/24/2018HousePresented to President.
10/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6876)
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/25/2018-6:20pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-6:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-6:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8815)
09/25/2018-6:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6758.
09/25/2018-6:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8815-8817)
09/25/2018-6:10pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 754.
09/25/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-966.
09/13/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/13/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/10/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/10/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/10/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Markup by
09/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-966

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6758. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-273 (10/31/2018)

Study of Underrepresented Classes Chasing Engineering and Science Success Act of 2018 or the SUCCESS Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) to study and report to Congress on the number of patents applied for and obtained: (1) by women, minorities, and veterans; and (2) by small businesses owned by women, minorities, and veterans.

The USPTO must provide legislative recommendations to increase the number of women, minorities, and veterans who participate in entrepreneurship activities and apply for patents.

(Sec. 4) Additionally, the bill amends the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act to extend for eight years the authority of the USPTO to set and adjust patent fees.