There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Family and Small Business Tax Cuts Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting Family and Small Business Tax Cuts Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Family and Small Business Tax Cuts Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent certain provisions of the Tax Cuts and Jobs Act affecting individuals, families, and small businesses.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 191 (Roll no. 414).
09/24/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-958.
09/10/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/01/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
09/28/2018-12:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:07pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 191 (Roll no. 414).
09/28/2018-11:59amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 184 - 226 (Roll no. 413).
09/28/2018-11:35amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9256)
09/28/2018-10:36amHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Larson (CT) motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit, and announced by voice vote that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Larson (CT) demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until later in the legislative day.
09/28/2018-10:36amHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
09/28/2018-10:24amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Larson (CT) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add at the end the following new title: Title III - Effective Date; "Protect Medicare and Social Security Trust Funds Act of 2018"
09/28/2018-10:24amHouseMr. Larson (CT) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Ways and Means. (text: CR H9172-9173)
09/28/2018-10:23amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
09/28/2018-9:16amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6760.
09/28/2018-9:15amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 6756, H.R. 6757 and H.R. 6760.
09/28/2018-9:15amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1084. (consideration: CR H9158-9174; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H9158-9165)
09/27/2018-2:02pmHouseRule H. Res. 1084 passed House.
09/26/2018-6:04pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1084 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6756, H.R. 6757 and H.R. 6760.
09/24/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 746.
09/24/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-958.
09/13/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 15.
09/13/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/10/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
09/10/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 09/10/2018
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 09/10/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/17/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 09/17/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/17/2018
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 09/17/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 09/17/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 09/17/2018
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/17/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 09/17/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/17/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/17/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/17/2018
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 09/17/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 09/17/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 09/17/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/10/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Markup by
09/24/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-958
Senate Finance10/01/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6760. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (09/24/2018)

Protecting Family and Small Business Tax Cuts Act of 2018

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent several tax provisions that were enacted in 2017 and are scheduled to expire at the end of 2025.

The bill makes permanent provisions that:

  • reduce individual tax rates,
  • modify the taxation of the unearned income of children,
  • allow a deduction for qualified business income of pass-through entities,
  • increase the standard deduction,
  • increase and modify the child tax credit,
  • increase the limitation for certain charitable contributions,
  • allow additional contributions to ABLE accounts (tax-favored accounts designed to enable individuals with disabilities to save for and pay for disability-related expenses),
  • allow certain members of the Armed Forces in the Sinai Peninsula of Egypt to receive combat zone tax benefits,
  • exclude from gross income discharges of student loan debt due to the death or disability of the student,
  • repeal the deduction for personal exemptions,
  • limit individual deductions for state and local taxes,
  • limit the mortgage interest deduction,
  • double the estate and gift tax exemption amount,
  • increase the alternative minimum tax exemption amount for individuals, and
  • repeal or limit several other deductions and exclusions.

The bill also:

  • extends through 2020 the reduction in the adjusted gross income threshold for the medical expense deduction,
  • modifies the capital gains tax brackets, and
  • modifies tax filing requirements for married taxpayers.