There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Iran Payments Accountability Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Director of National Intelligence to seek to determine if the Government of Iran has used certain funds received by reason of sanctions relief pursuant to the Joint Comprehensive Plan of Action or cash payments conveyed by the United States in early 2016 to sponsor foreign terrorist organizations, facilitate illicit narcotics activities, or conduct military operations in Syria, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
09/12/2018Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2018Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (14)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/12/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/13/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/13/2018
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 09/13/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 09/13/2018
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 09/13/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/17/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/17/2018
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/25/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/25/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 09/25/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 09/25/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 09/25/2018
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/27/2018
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/13/2018 09/26/2018 H8905
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/13/2018 09/26/2018 H8905
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/13/2018 09/26/2018 H8905
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/13/2018 09/26/2018 H8905
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/13/2018 09/26/2018 H8905

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)09/12/2018 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs09/12/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6774.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6774. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/12/2018)

Iran Payments Accountability Act of 2018

This bill requires the Office of the Director of National Intelligence (ODNI) to determine if the Government of Iran uses certain funds to: (1) sponsor any foreign terrorist organization or Iran's Revolutionary Guard Corps, (2) engage in violence or hostilities against U.S. civilians or service members, (3) conduct military operations in Syria, or (4) facilitate illicit narcotics activities. The applicable funds are those received by Iran as sanction relief or as a cash payment from the United States in 2016.

The Department of State must demand repayment of funds from the Government of Iran if the ODNI determines funds were used for such actions.