There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Settlement Agreement Information Database Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Settlement Agreement Information Database Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Settlement Agreement Information Database Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 3 of title 5, United States Code, to require the publication of settlement agreements, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/29/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9722-9723)
11/27/2018Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-1046.
09/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
12/03/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
11/29/2018-5:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/29/2018-5:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9722-9723)
11/29/2018-5:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6777.
11/29/2018-5:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9722-9723)
11/29/2018-5:50pmHouseMr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/27/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 813.
11/27/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-1046.
09/27/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/12/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
09/12/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform09/12/2018 Referred to
09/27/2018 Markup by
11/27/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1046
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/03/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6777.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6777. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/12/2018)

Settlement Agreement Information Database Act of 2019

This bill requires executive agencies to submit information regarding settlement agreements to a public database. Specifically, an agency must submit information regarding any settlement agreement (including a consent decree) entered into by the agency related to an alleged violation of federal law. If an agency determines that information regarding an agreement must remain confidential to protect the public interest, the agency must publish an explanation of why the information is confidential.