Text: H.R.6784 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (11/26/2018)


115th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 6784


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

November 26, 2018

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works


AN ACT

To provide for removal of the gray wolf in the contiguous 48 States from the List of Endangered and Threatened Wildlife published under the Endangered Species Act of 1973.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Manage our Wolves Act”.

SEC. 2. Removal of Federal protections for gray wolves in Wyoming and Western Great Lakes.

(a) gray wolves in Wyoming.—The final rule published on September 10, 2012 (77 Fed. Reg. 55530), that was reinstated on March 3, 2017, by the decision of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia (No. 14–5300) and further republished on May 1, 2017 (82 Fed. Reg. 20284), that reinstates the removal of Federal protections for the gray wolf in Wyoming under the Endangered Species Act of 1973 (16 U.S.C. 1531 et seq.), and this subsection, shall not be subject to judicial review.

(b) gray wolves in Western Great Lakes.—Before the end of the 60-day period beginning on the date of enactment of this Act, the Secretary of the Interior shall reissue the final rule published on December 28, 2011 (76 Fed. Reg. 81666), without regard to any other provision of statute or regulation that applies to issuance of such rule. Such reissuance (including this subsection) shall not be subject to judicial review.

SEC. 3. Removal of Federal protections for gray wolves range-wide.

(a) In general.—Not later than the end of fiscal year 2019, and except as provided in subsection (b), the Secretary of the Interior shall issue a rule to remove the gray wolf (Canis lupus) in each of the 48 contiguous States of the United States and the District of Columbia from the List of Endangered and Threatened Wildlife in section 17.11 of title 50, Code of Federal Regulations, without regard to any other provision of statute or regulation that applies to issuance of such rule.

(b) limitation on judicial review.—Such issuance (including this section)—

(1) shall not be subject to judicial review; and

(2) shall not affect the inclusion of the subspecies classified as the Mexican gray wolf (Canis lupus baileyi) of the species gray wolf (Canis lupus) in such list.

Passed the House of Representatives November 16, 2018.

    Attest: karen l. haas,   
    Clerk.