There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Construction Consensus Procurement Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Construction Consensus Procurement Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 41, United States Code, to improve the manner in which Federal contracts for design and construction services are awarded, to prohibit the use of reverse auctions for design and construction services procurements, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/29/2017 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-68.
01/24/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/29/2017 Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 39.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2017 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-68.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/02/2017 Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/02/2017 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
01/24/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/31/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/31/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/24/2017 Referred to
02/02/2017 Markup by
03/29/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-68

Related Bills (0)

As of 10/17/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.679 - Construction Consensus Procurement Improvement Act of 2017.

Subjects (8)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Building construction
  • Congressional oversight
  • Government buildings, facilities, and property
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
  • Public contracts and procurement

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.679. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2017)

Construction Consensus Procurement Improvement Act of 2017

This bill modifies the design-build selection procedures used by federal agencies soliciting offers to enter into civilian contracts for the design and construction of a public building, facility, or work. Two-phase selection procedures (i.e., submission of qualifications and then the submission of price and technical proposals in response to a request for proposal) must be used if a contracting officer determines that a project has a value of $3 million or greater. But for contracts valued at less than $3 million, the contracting officer makes the same determination under current law as to whether the use of two-phase selection procedures is appropriate if the officer anticipates at least three offers for the contract.

Federal agencies must report, each year over a five-year period, on each instance where the agency awarded a design-build contract in which: (1) more than five finalists were selected for phase-two requests for proposals, or (2) the contract or order was awarded without using two-phase selection procedures. The Government Accountability Office must report on agency compliance with design-build contract procedures.

The Federal Acquisition Regulation shall be amended to prohibit the use of reverse auctions as part of the two-phase selection procedures for awarding contracts for construction and design services. A "reverse auction," with respect to any procurement by an executive agency, is: (1) a real-time auction conducted through an electronic medium among at least two offerors who compete by submitting bids for a supply or service contract, or a delivery order, task order, or purchase order under the contract, with the ability to submit revised lower bids before the closing of the auction; and (2) the award of the contract, delivery order, task order, or purchase order to the offeror based on the price obtained through the auction process.