There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To transfer a bridge over the Wabash River to the States of Illinois and Indiana, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/27/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9655-9656)
11/27/2018Committee on Transportation discharged.
09/13/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/28/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
11/27/2018-7:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/27/2018-7:35pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9655-9656)
11/27/2018-7:35pmHouseH.Amdt.980 On agreeing to the Mast amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
11/27/2018-7:35pmHouseH.Amdt.980 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Mast. (consideration: CR H9656; text: CR H9656)
11/27/2018-7:34pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9655-9656)
11/27/2018HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
11/27/2018-7:34pmHouseMr. Mast asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/14/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/13/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
09/13/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/13/2018 Referred to
11/27/2018 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit09/14/2018 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works11/28/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6793. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/27/2018)

Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the White County Bridge Commission to convey, without consideration, to the New Harmony Bridge Bi-State Commission, all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to the bridge and the approaches thereto across the Wabash River at or near New Harmony, Indiana, under the jurisdiction of the commission.

The Act of April 12, 1941 (creating the commission) is repealed effective on the date that the commission completes such conveyance.