There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Life at Conception Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To implement equal protection under the 14th article of amendment to the Constitution for the right to life of each born and preborn human person.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
01/24/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/24/2017 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2017 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H613)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (131)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 01/24/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 02/01/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 02/01/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/03/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/26/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 04/26/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/02/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/02/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 05/02/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 05/17/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 05/17/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 05/17/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 05/17/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/17/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 05/22/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/23/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/24/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/24/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/07/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/12/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/12/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/12/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 06/22/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/22/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 07/17/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 07/17/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 07/27/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 08/08/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 09/05/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 09/05/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/06/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 09/06/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/06/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/12/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/25/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 09/25/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/02/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/06/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/06/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/11/2017
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/23/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 10/27/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 11/14/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 11/14/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/28/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/04/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/04/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 12/04/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 12/06/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 12/06/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/06/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 12/07/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/07/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/12/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 12/12/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 12/12/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/12/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 12/18/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 12/18/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 12/20/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/20/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 01/12/2018
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/12/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/18/2018
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 01/18/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/18/2018
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/18/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/18/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 01/18/2018
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 01/18/2018
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 01/18/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/24/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice01/24/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (4)

  • Abortion
  • Constitution and constitutional amendments
  • Genetics

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.681. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2017)

Life at Conception Act

This bill declares that the right to life guaranteed by the Constitution is vested in each human being at all stages of life, including the moment of fertilization, cloning, or other moment at which an individual comes into being. Nothing in this bill shall be construed to authorize the prosecution of any woman for the death of her unborn child.