There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

DIGIT Act
Developing Innovation and Growing the Internet of Things Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure appropriate spectrum planning and interagency coordination to support the Internet of Things.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/24/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/13/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/27/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/04/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/24/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (9)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Advisory bodies
  • Computer security and identity theft
  • Digital media
  • Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
  • International organizations and cooperation
  • Internet and video services
  • Right of privacy

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.686. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2017)

Developing Innovation and Growing the Internet of Things Act or the DIGIT Act

This bill requires the Department of Commerce to convene a working group of federal stakeholders to provide recommendations and a report to Congress regarding the growing number of connected and interconnected devices known as the Internet of Things (IoT). The bill establishes a steering committee to be composed of stakeholders outside the federal government to advise the working group.

The Federal Communications Commission must: (1) seek public comment on the IoT's spectrum needs, regulatory barriers, and growth with licensed and unlicensed spectrum; and (2) submit a summary of those comments to Congress.