There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthening Minority-Serving Institutions Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To permanently reauthorize mandatory funding programs for historically Black colleges and universities and other minority-serving institutions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/25/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/25/2018Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 09/25/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 09/27/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 09/27/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/27/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/27/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/27/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/28/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/02/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/02/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/02/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/12/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/26/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 10/26/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce09/25/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6876. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/25/2018)

Strengthening Minority-Serving Institutions Act of 2018

This bill permanently extends mandatory funding programs for historically Black colleges and universities and other minority-serving institutions and increases the authorized funding levels for such programs.