There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

HEARTS Act of 2018
Health Equity and Access for Returning Troops and Servicemembers Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

HEARTS Act of 2018
Health Equity and Access for Returning Troops and Servicemembers Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to modify the requirement for certain former members of the Armed Forces to enroll in Medicare Part B to be eligible for TRICARE for Life, and to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for coverage of certain DNA specimen provenance assay tests under the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/28/2018Committee on Armed Services discharged.
09/28/2018Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
09/28/2018Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/25/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
10/01/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
09/28/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/28/2018-9:13amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-9:13amHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
09/28/2018-9:13amHouseH.Amdt.971 On agreeing to the Johnson, Sam amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-9:12amHouseH.Amdt.971 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Johnson, Sam. (consideration: CR H9157-9158; text: CR H9157-9158)
09/28/2018-9:12amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9156-9195; text of measure as introduced: CR H9156-9157)
09/28/2018-9:11amHouseMr. Johnson, Sam asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/26/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
09/25/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/25/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/25/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/25/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/25/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/27/2018

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/25/2018 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
House Ways and Means09/25/2018 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health09/28/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services09/25/2018 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel09/26/2018 Referred to
Senate Finance10/01/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6886. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/25/2018)

Health Equity and Access for Returning Troops and Servicemembers Act of 2018 or the HEARTS Act of 2018

This bill (1) exempts certain military retirees who are under 65 years of age, and who no longer receive Social Security Disability Insurance benefits, from the requirement to enroll in Medicare medical services in order to be eligible for TRICARE; (2) increases funding for the Medicare Improvement Fund; and (3) temporarily provides for Medicare coverage of certain prostate cancer DNA Specimen Provenance Assay tests.