There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the continued performance of the functions of the United States Parole Commission, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-274.
10/31/2018Signed by President.
10/24/2018Presented to President.
10/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/2018Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6802-6803)
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9392-9393)
09/28/2018Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-274.
10/31/2018Signed by President.
10/24/2018HousePresented to President.
10/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/11/2018SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6802-6803)
10/01/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/28/2018-12:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:36pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9392-9393)
09/28/2018-12:36pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9392-9393)
09/28/2018-12:36pmHouseMr. Marino asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/26/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/26/2018 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary10/01/2018 Referred to
10/11/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6896.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6896. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/26/2018)

United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2018

This bill extends for two years the authority and functions of the U.S. Parole Commission, including the requirement to submit data to Congress on each type of case under its jurisdiction.

Additionally, the bill amends the Prison Rape Elimination Act of 2003 to require auditors who monitor compliance with national prison rape standards to be certified.