There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2018, Part II

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2018, Part II

Short Titles as Introduced

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2018, Part II

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2018, Part II

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the authorizations of Federal aviation programs, to extend the funding and expenditure authority of the Airport and Airway Trust Fund, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
09/29/2018Became Public Law No: 115-250. (TXT | PDF)
09/29/2018Signed by President.
09/28/2018Presented to President.
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6390-6391)
09/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9060)
09/26/2018Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
09/26/2018Committee on Transportation discharged.
09/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
09/29/2018Became Public Law No: 115-250. (TXT | PDF)
09/29/2018Signed by President.
09/28/2018HousePresented to President.
09/28/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6390-6391)
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/26/2018-5:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2018-5:54pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9060)
09/26/2018-5:54pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9060)
09/26/2018HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
09/26/2018HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
09/26/2018-5:53pmHouseMr. Shuster asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/26/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/26/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation09/26/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Discharged from
House Ways and Means09/26/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6897.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6897. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-250 (09/29/2018)

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2018, Part II

(Sec. 2) This bill extends: (1) airport planning and development and noise compatibility planning and programs at increased levels until October 7, 2018; (2) various expiring aviation authorities, including those under the Vision 100-Century of Aviation Reauthorization Act and the FAA Modernization and Reform Act of 2012, through such date; (3) the expenditure authority of the Airport and Airway Trust Fund through October 8, 2018, and (4) excise taxes for such fund through such date.