There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Juvenile Justice Reform Act of 2018

Other Short Titles

Juvenile Justice Reform Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Juvenile Justice Reform Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Juvenile Justice Reform Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Juvenile Justice Reform Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize and improve the Juvenile Justice and Delinquency Prevention Act of 1974, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-385.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/19/2018Presented to President.
12/13/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H10175-10184)
12/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9359-9369)
09/28/2018Committee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
09/28/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-385.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/19/2018HousePresented to President.
12/13/2018-11:13amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/13/2018-11:13amHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H10175-10184)
12/13/2018-11:13amHouseMr. Lewis (MN) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10175-10184)
12/13/2018-11:13amHouseMr. Lewis (MN) asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
12/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/11/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/11/2018SenateS.Amdt.4075 Amendment SA 4075 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2018SenateS.Amdt.4075 Amendment SA 4075 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S7452) In the nature of a substitute.
12/11/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7452)
10/02/2018SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 612.
10/01/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/28/2018-12:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:31pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9359-9369)
09/28/2018-12:31pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9359-9369)
09/28/2018-12:31pmHouseMr. Lewis (MN) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on Education and the Workforce discharged.
09/28/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
09/28/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/28/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce09/28/2018 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.