There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a land conveyance involving the Elkhorn Ranch and the White River National Forest in the State of Colorado, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-252. (TXT | PDF)
10/03/2018Signed by President.
09/25/2018Presented to President.
09/18/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6259)
05/16/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-69.
02/06/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H982)
01/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/03/2018Became Public Law No: 115-252. (TXT | PDF)
10/03/2018Signed by President.
09/25/2018HousePresented to President.
09/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/18/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6259)
05/16/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 87.
05/16/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-69.
03/30/2017SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/07/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
02/06/2017-5:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/06/2017-5:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H982)
02/06/2017-4:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 698.
02/06/2017-4:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H982-983)
02/06/2017-4:53pmHouseMr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/24/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/24/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/24/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/24/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/24/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/07/2017 Referred to
03/30/2017 Markup by
05/16/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-69

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.698. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-252 (10/03/2018)

Elkhorn Ranch and White River National Forest Conveyance Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill requires all interest of the United States in approximately 148 acres of identified land to be conveyed by patent to the Gordman-Leverich Partnership (GLP), a Colorado Limited Liability Partnership.

The conveyance: (1) is subject to the valid existing rights of the lessee of federal oil and gas lease COC-75070 and any other valid existing rights, and (2) shall reserve to the United States the right to collect rent and royalty payments on such lease for its duration.

The conveyance shall: (1) be completed by no later than 180 days of enactment of this bill; and (2) be without consideration, except that all costs incurred by the Department of the Interior relating to any survey, platting, legal description, or other activities carried out to prepare and issue the patent shall be paid by the GLP to Interior prior to the conveyance of such land.