There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

No Federal Funds for Public Charge Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that no Federal funds may be used to carry out the proposed rule of the Department of Homeland Security entitled "Inadmissibility on Public Charge Grounds", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/09/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/15/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/09/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/09/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/09/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/09/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/09/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/09/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/09/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/12/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/12/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/12/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/26/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/26/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/13/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/13/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 12/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/09/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security11/15/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.7052.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7052. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/09/2018)

No Federal Funds for Public Charge Act of 2018

This bill prohibits the use of federal funds to implement, administer, enforce, or carry out the proposed rule of the Department of Homeland Security entitled "Inadmissibility on Public Charge Grounds." The rule makes aliens who are likely at any time to become a public charge and receive public benefits inadmissible.