There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Build the Wall, Enforce the Law Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To fund construction of the southern border wall and to ensure compliance with Federal immigration law.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
10/18/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
10/12/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 10/16/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/16/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 10/16/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/16/2018
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/16/2018
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 10/16/2018
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/16/2018
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/16/2018
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/16/2018
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/16/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/16/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/16/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 10/16/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 10/16/2018
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 10/16/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 10/16/2018
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 10/16/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 10/16/2018
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 10/16/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 10/16/2018
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/19/2018
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/19/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/19/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/19/2018
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/19/2018
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 10/19/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/19/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/19/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/19/2018
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/19/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 10/19/2018
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/19/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/19/2018
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 10/19/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 10/23/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 10/23/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/23/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/23/2018
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/23/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/23/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/26/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/26/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/26/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/26/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/26/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/26/2018
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 10/30/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/30/2018
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/30/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/30/2018
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/02/2018
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/02/2018
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/02/2018
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/02/2018
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/06/2018
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 11/16/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 11/27/2018
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/27/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/29/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/11/2018

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/12/2018 Referred to
House Homeland Security10/12/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means10/12/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade10/18/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services10/12/2018 Referred to
House Budget10/12/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7059. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/12/2018)

Build the Wall, Enforce the Law Act of 2018

This bill amends the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to modify provisions relating to the enforcement of immigration laws. Specifically, the bill prohibits any individual (e.g., an employer) from restricting or interfering with the enforcement of the immigration laws by federal officials. It also denies states or localities (i.e., sanctuary jurisdictions) that fail to cooperate in the enforcement of the immigration laws eligibility for federal funds and law enforcement grants under the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968.

The bill amends detainer provisions to authorize the Department of Homeland Security to issue detainers for the arrest of an illegal alien if there is probable cause to believe that the alien is inadmissible or deportable. It also provides qualified immunity to governmental and certain nongovernmental entities that detain an alien, except in cases of mistreatment, and allows a private right of action to relatives of victims of crime committed by an alien released from custody by a state or local governmental entity that failed to honor a detainer.

The bill also

  • revises provisions requiring detention of aliens during the pendency of removal proceedings to require indefinite detention of aliens who have committed certain serious crimes;
  • enhances penalties for the criminal offense of reentry after removal;
  • establishes new and specific grounds of inadmissibility and deportability for aliens who are members of designated criminal gangs (consisting of five or more persons); and
  • provides funding for border barriers, technology and other resources at the southern border to prevent illegal entry.