Text: H.R.7073 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/19/2018)


115th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 7073


To provide for reconciliation pursuant to title II of the concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2019.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

October 19, 2018

Mr. Byrne (for himself, Mr. Cramer, Mr. Rogers of Alabama, Mr. Brooks of Alabama, Mr. Burgess, Mr. Francis Rooney of Florida, Mr. Babin, Mr. Banks of Indiana, Mr. Gosar, Mr. Gaetz, Mr. Norman, Mr. Biggs, Mr. Posey, Mr. Mooney of West Virginia, Mr. DesJarlais, and Mr. Smith of Texas) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Homeland Security


A BILL

To provide for reconciliation pursuant to title II of the concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2019.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “50 Votes for the Wall Act”.

SEC. 2. Border Wall and Security Trust Fund.

(a) Establishment of fund.—There is established a fund, to be known as the “Border Wall and Security Trust Fund”, consisting of such amounts as may be appropriated pursuant to subsection (b) to construct a wall (including physical barriers and associated detection technology, roads, and lighting) along the international border between the United States and Mexico by January 19, 2021.

(b) Appropriation of amounts.—There is hereby appropriated to the Border Wall and Security Trust Fund established under subsection (a), out of any money in the Treasury not otherwise appropriated, such sums as the Secretary of Homeland Security may request of the Secretary of Treasury on or after October 1, 2018, up to a total of $25,000,000,000, to remain available until expended to carry out the purpose described in subsection (a).

(c) Sunset.—The authority provided by this Act shall terminate on September 30, 2028, and the unobligated balance of any amounts in the Border Wall and Security Trust Fund on such date shall be returned to the general fund of the Treasury.