There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Health Coverage State Flexibility Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to better align the grace period required for non-payment of premiums before discontinuing coverage under qualified health plans with such grace periods provided for under State law.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/27/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/13/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/13/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/15/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/16/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/27/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/08/2017 Referred to

As of 06/25/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.710 - Health Coverage State Flexibility Act of 2017.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.710. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/27/2017)

Health Coverage State Flexibility Act of 2017

This bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to revise the grace period that health insurers must provide to recipients of premium subsidies before discontinuing health coverage for nonpayment of premiums. The grace period is shortened from 3 months to 30 days unless state law includes an applicable grace period.