Text: H.R.7143 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/16/2018)


115th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 7143


To amend title II of the Social Security Act to modernize social security account numbers, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

November 16, 2018

Mr. Sam Johnson of Texas introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


A BILL

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to modernize social security account numbers, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Social Security Number Modernization Act of 2018”.

SEC. 2. Public listing of social security account numbers.

(a) In general.—Section 205(c)(2)(B) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 405(c)(2)(B)) is amended by adding at the end the following:

“(iv) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, including subparagraph (C)(viii) of this paragraph and section 552a of title 5, United States Code, the Commissioner of Social Security shall maintain a complete public listing of each social security account number that has been assigned to any individual at any time.”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by subsection (a) shall take effect on October 1, 2028.

SEC. 3. Phaseout of paper social security cards.

Section 205(c)(2)(G) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 405(c)(2)(G)) is amended—

(1) by striking “The Commissioner” and inserting “For individuals who are issued a social security account number before October 1, 2023, the Commissioner”; and

(2) by adding at the end the following: “The Commissioner of Social Security may not issue a replacement for the social security card of any individual on or after October 1, 2028.”

SEC. 4. Report on Federal use of social security account numbers.

Not later than January 15, 2021, the Comptroller General of the United States shall submit a report to Congress on all uses of the social security account number by each Federal agency, which includes the citation of any associated requirement (including statutory, regulatory, and other requirements). The Comptroller General shall submit to Congress a biennial update of such report not later than January 15 of the 1st session of each Congress.