There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Listing Reform Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Listing Reform Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to require review of the economic cost of adding a species to the list of endangered species or threatened species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/15/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-560.
01/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
02/15/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 421.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-560.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/04/2017Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 13.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/04/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/19/2017Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/27/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/27/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Hearings by
10/04/2017 Markup by
02/15/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-560

As of 12/18/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.717 - Listing Reform Act.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.717. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (02/15/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Listing Reform Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to allow the Department of the Interior or the Department of Commerce, as appropriate, to prioritize the consideration of petitions to list a species as endangered or threatened other than in the order in which the petitions are received. The appropriate department may not give general priority to petitions to add species to the list of endangered or threatened species over petitions to remove a species from the list.

The deadline for the appropriate department to decide on whether or not a petition to list or remove a species should be granted is changed from within 12 months to as expeditiously as possible.

The appropriate department is given the authority to preclude the listing of a species as threatened due to the likelihood of significant, cumulative economic effects that would result from such listing or from the likely resulting designation of critical habitat of the species. Once a petition is precluded due to those economic effects, the appropriate department may not reconsider that finding unless the department: (1) determines there is endangerment of extinction of the species; or (2) receives a new petition to add the species to the list that includes an analyses concluding that alternative actions are possible other than those resulting in significant, cumulative economic effects.