There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

GAO Access and Oversight Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

GAO Access and Oversight Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

GAO Access and Oversight Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure the Government Accountability Office has adequate access to information.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/31/2017Became Public Law No: 115-3. (TXT | PDF)
01/31/2017Signed by President.
01/23/2017Presented to President.
01/17/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 99 - 0. Record Vote Number: 28.
01/17/2017Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S333-335)
01/04/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H70)
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/31/2017Became Public Law No: 115-3. (TXT | PDF)
01/31/2017Signed by President.
01/23/2017HousePresented to President.
01/17/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/17/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 99 - 0. Record Vote Number: 28.
01/17/2017SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S333-335)
01/05/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
01/04/2017-1:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/04/2017-1:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H70)
01/04/2017-1:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 72.
01/04/2017-1:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H70-71)
01/04/2017-1:13pmHouseMr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/03/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/03/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform01/03/2017 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/05/2017 Referred to
01/17/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.72. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-3 (01/31/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

GAO Access and Oversight Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to obtain federal agency records required to discharge the GAO's duties (including audit, evaluation, and investigative duties), including through bringing civil actions to require an agency to produce a record.

No provision of the Social Security Act shall be construed to limit, amend, or supersede the GAO's authority to: (1) obtain information or inspect records about an agency's duties, powers, activities, organization, or financial transactions; or (2) obtain other agency records that the GAO requires to discharge its duties.

Agency statements on actions taken or planned in response to GAO recommendations must be submitted to: (1) the congressional committees with jurisdiction over the pertinent agency program or activity, and (2) the GAO.