There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.720. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/10/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Lawsuit Abuse Reduction Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the sanctions provisions in Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to require the court to impose an appropriate sanction on any attorney, law firm, or party that has violated, or is responsible for the violation of, the rule with regard to representations to the court. Any sanction must compensate parties injured by the conduct in question.

The bill removes a provision that prohibits filing a motion for sanctions if the challenged paper, claim, defense, contention, or denial is withdrawn or appropriately corrected within 21 days after service or within another time the court sets.

Courts may impose additional sanctions, including striking the pleadings, dismissing the suit, nonmonetary directives, or penalty payments if warranted for effective deterrence.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/10/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 230 - 188 (Roll no. 158).(text: CR H2030)
02/24/2017 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-16.
01/30/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (36)

Date Chamber
03/13/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
03/10/2017-11:30am House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/10/2017-11:30am House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 230 - 188 (Roll no. 158). (text: CR H2030)
03/10/2017-11:19am House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 186 - 232 (Roll no. 157).
03/10/2017-11:12am House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
03/10/2017-11:05am House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back with an amendment to add a section at the end of the bill prohibiting language to be construed to apply to a civil action that implicates the foreign emoluments clause of the United States Constitution.
03/10/2017-11:05am House Ms. Lofgren moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H2039)
03/10/2017-11:04am House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
03/10/2017-11:03am House The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 720.
03/10/2017-11:03am House H.Amdt.79 On agreeing to the Jeffries amendment (A004) Failed by recorded vote: 189 - 229 (Roll no. 156).
03/10/2017-10:59am House H.Amdt.78 On agreeing to the Conyers amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 190 - 227 (Roll no. 155).
03/10/2017-10:54am House H.Amdt.77 On agreeing to the Jackson Lee amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 185 - 225 (Roll no. 154).
03/10/2017-10:50am House H.Amdt.76 On agreeing to the Soto amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 181 - 225 (Roll no. 153).
03/10/2017-10:27am House UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was on amendments which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
03/10/2017-10:27am House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Jeffries amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Jeffries demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
03/10/2017-10:19am House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 180, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Jeffries Part A amendment No. 4.
03/10/2017-10:19am House H.Amdt.79 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Jeffries. (consideration: CR H2035-2036, H2038; text: CR H2035)
03/10/2017-10:19am House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Conyers amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Conyers demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
03/10/2017-10:12am House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 180, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Conyers Part A amendment No. 3.
03/10/2017-10:12am House H.Amdt.78 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Conyers. (consideration: CR H2033-2035, H2037-2038; text: CR H2033)
03/10/2017-10:11am House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Jackson Lee amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Jackson Lee demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
03/10/2017-10:04am House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 180, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Jackson Lee Part A amendment No. 2.
03/10/2017-10:04am House H.Amdt.77 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Jackson Lee. (consideration: CR H2031-2033, H2036-2037; text: CR H2031)
03/10/2017-10:04am House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Soto amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Soto demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until a time to be announced.
03/10/2017-9:56am House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 180, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Soto Part A amendment No. 1.
03/10/2017-9:56am House H.Amdt.76 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Soto. (consideration: CR H2030-2031, H2036; text: CR H2030)
03/10/2017-9:15am House GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 720.
03/10/2017-9:15am House The Speaker designated the Honorable Evan H. Jenkins to act as Chairman of the Committee.
03/10/2017-9:15am House House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 180 and Rule XVIII.
03/10/2017-9:14am House Providing for consideration of the bills H.R. 720 and H.R. 985.
03/10/2017-9:14am House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 180. (consideration: CR H2025-2041)
02/24/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 4.
02/24/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-16.
Action By: House Judiciary
01/31/2017 House Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: House Judiciary
01/30/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/30/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (4)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

Lawsuit Abuse Reduction Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House:

Lawsuit Abuse Reduction Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced:

Lawsuit Abuse Reduction Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to improve attorney accountability, and for other purposes.


Subjects (5)

  • Civil actions and liability
  • Judicial procedure and administration
  • Lawyers and legal services
  • Legal fees and court costs

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/30/2017 Referred to
02/24/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-16
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice01/31/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary03/13/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.