There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish the Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Office, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-387.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/19/2018Presented to President.
12/18/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S7822)
12/10/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9804-9806)
12/10/2018Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
12/10/2018Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
12/03/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-387.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/19/2018HousePresented to President.
12/19/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7822)
12/11/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/10/2018-7:05pmHouseUNANIMOUS CONSENT REQUEST - Mr. Donovan asked unanimous consent that an exchange of letters between the Chairman of the Committee on Energy and Commerce and the Chairman of the Committee on Homeland Security be included in the Record. Agreed to without objection.
12/10/2018-7:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/10/2018-7:05pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9804-9806)
12/10/2018-7:04pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9804-9806)
12/10/2018HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
12/10/2018HouseCommittee on Homeland Security discharged.
12/10/2018-7:04pmHouseMr. Donovan asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
12/03/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/03/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/03/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/03/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security12/03/2018 Referred to
12/10/2018 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce12/03/2018 Referred to
12/10/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.7213. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-387 (12/21/2018)

Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) a Countering Weapons of Mass Destruction Office, headed by an Assistant Secretary. The Assistant Secretary shall serve as the principal advisor to DHS on weapons of mass destruction matters and strategies, and on coordinating efforts to counter weapons of mass destruction.

The office shall coordinate DHS strategy and policy to plan, detect, and protect against the importation, possession, storage, transportation, development, or use of unauthorized chemical, biological, radiological, or nuclear materials, devices, or agents.

The Assistant Secretary shall establish the Securing the Cities program to detect and prevent terrorist attacks and other high consequence events utilizing nuclear or other radiological materials that pose a high risk to homeland security in high-risk urban areas.

The bill establishes in the office a Chief Medical Officer who shall serve as the principal advisor to DHS on medical and public health issues.

DHS shall transfer to the office all personnel, budget authority, and assets of the Domestic Nuclear Detection Office and the Office of Health Affairs.