There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reproductive Rights are Human Rights Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to include in the Annual Country Reports on Human Rights Practices a section on reproductive rights, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/10/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
12/10/2018Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/10/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/10/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 12/10/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 12/10/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 12/10/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 12/10/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 12/10/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 12/10/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/11/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/11/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/11/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/11/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 12/12/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/12/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 12/17/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 12/17/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/17/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs12/10/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.7228.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.