There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Water Infrastructure Improvement Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Water Infrastructure Improvement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Water Infrastructure Improvement Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Water Infrastructure Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to provide for an integrated planning process, to promote green infrastructure, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-436. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S8036)
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 351 - 10 (Roll no. 441).(text: CR H10288-10289)
12/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-436. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019HousePresented to President.
12/22/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8036)
12/20/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/19/2018-7:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2018-7:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 351 - 10 (Roll no. 441). (text: CR H10288-10289)
12/19/2018-7:27pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10317)
12/19/2018-4:24pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Massie objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
12/19/2018-4:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7279.
12/19/2018-4:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10288-10291)
12/19/2018-4:05pmHouseMr. Gibbs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/13/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/12/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
12/12/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/12/2018 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment12/13/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.7279. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-436 (01/14/2019)

Water Infrastructure Improvement Act

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to allow municipalities to develop a plan that integrates wastewater and stormwater management.

A permit for a municipal discharge under the national pollutant discharge elimination system that incorporates an integrated plan may integrate all requirements under the Act addressed in the plan, such as requirements relating to combined sewer overflows, sanitary sewer collection systems, and total maximum daily loads. A plan that is incorporated into a permit may include the implementation of green infrastructure and projects to reclaim, recycle, or reuse water. Green infrastructure includes measures that mimic natural processes to store, reuse, or reduce stormwater.

Those permits may include a schedule of compliance that allows actions for meeting water quality-based effluent limitations to be implemented over more than one permit term if the compliance schedules are authorized by state water quality standards.

A municipality under an administrative order or settlement agreement may request a modification of the order or settlement based on the municipality's integrated plan.

The EPA must report on each integrated plan developed and implemented through a permit, order, or judicial consent decree since June 5, 2012, including a description of the control measures, levels of control, estimated costs, and compliance schedules for the requirements implemented through such a plan.

(Sec. 4) The bill establishes an Office of the Municipal Ombudsman in the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to provide: (1) technical assistance to municipalities seeking to comply with the Clean Water Act, and (2) information to the EPA to ensure that agency policies are implemented by all EPA offices.

(Sec. 5) The EPA must promote the use of green infrastructure.