There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Assets Sale and Transfer Act of 2016 to ensure that the Public Buildings Reform Board has adequate time to carry out the responsibilities of the Board, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-437. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8034)
12/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 372 - 2 (Roll no. 475).(text: CR H10514)
12/17/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-437. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019HousePresented to President.
12/22/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8034)
12/21/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/21/2018-10:18amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2018-10:18amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 372 - 2 (Roll no. 475). (text: CR H10514)
12/21/2018-10:14amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10532-10533)
12/21/2018-9:12amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-9:09amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7318.
12/21/2018-9:09amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10514-10515)
12/21/2018-9:09amHouseMr. Mast moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/18/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/17/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
12/17/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 12/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/17/2018 Referred to
House Transportation Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management12/18/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.7318. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-437 (01/14/2019)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Federal Assets Sale and Transfer Act of 2016 to remove the deadline for appointment of members to the Public Buildings Reform Board and revise the board's termination date to six years after its members have been selected for appointment pursuant to the Act.