There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Assets Sale and Transfer Act of 2016 to provide flexibility with respect to the leaseback of certain Federal real property, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-438. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8025)
12/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 372 - 1 (Roll no. 476).(text: CR H10515)
12/17/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-438. (TXT | PDF)
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019HousePresented to President.
12/22/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8025)
12/21/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
12/21/2018-10:22amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2018-10:22amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 372 - 1 (Roll no. 476). (text: CR H10515)
12/21/2018-10:18amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10533-10534)
12/21/2018-9:14amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-9:12amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7319.
12/21/2018-9:12amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10515)
12/21/2018-9:12amHouseMr. Mast moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/18/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
12/17/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
12/17/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 12/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure12/17/2018 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management12/18/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.7319. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-438 (01/14/2019)

(Sec. 1) This bill allows existing improvements on a property sold under the Federal Assets Sale and Transfer Act of 2016 to be leased back to the federal government for up to three years for the purpose of facilitating the sale of the property.