There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Separation of Powers Restoration Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to clarify the nature of judicial review of agency interpretations of statutory and regulatory provisions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/05/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2017 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/03/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11]* 01/03/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/03/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/06/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/06/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/06/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/10/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/10/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 01/10/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/10/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 01/10/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 01/10/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 01/31/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/17/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 03/10/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 06/08/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 07/17/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law01/05/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (4)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Constitution and constitutional amendments
  • Judicial review and appeals

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.76. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Separation of Powers Restoration Act of 2017

This bill modifies the scope of judicial review of agency actions to authorize courts reviewing agency actions to decide de novo (without giving deference to the agency's interpretation) all relevant questions of law, including the interpretation of: (1) constitutional and statutory provisions, and (2) rules made by agencies.

No law may exempt such a civil action from the application of the amendments made by this bill except by specific reference to these provisions.