There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

SOAR to Health and Wellness Act of 2018
Stop, Observe, Ask, and Respond to Health and Wellness Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SOAR to Health and Wellness Act of 2018
Stop, Observe, Ask, and Respond to Health and Wellness Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

SOAR to Health and Wellness Act of 2017
Stop, Observe, Ask, and Respond to Health and Wellness Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

SOAR to Health and Wellness Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Stop, Observe, Ask, and Respond to Health and Wellness Training pilot program to address human trafficking in the health care system.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-398.
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018Presented to President.
12/20/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 6 (Roll no. 462).(consideration: CR H10439-10440; text: CR H10424)
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/20/2018Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1234-1235)
09/25/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-327.
01/31/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-398.
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018HousePresented to President.
12/20/2018-2:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2018-2:44pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 6 (Roll no. 462). (consideration: CR H10439-10440; text: CR H10424)
12/20/2018-1:10pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/20/2018-1:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 767.
12/20/2018-1:04pmHouseMr. Guthrie moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10424-10425)
12/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
12/20/2018SenateS.Amdt.4173 Amendment SA 4173 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2018SenateS.Amdt.4173 Amendment SA 4173 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S7945-7959; text: CR S7949-7590) In the nature of a substitute.
12/20/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7949-7950)
12/20/2018SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/27/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
02/26/2018-5:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/26/2018-5:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1234-1235)
02/26/2018-5:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 767.
02/26/2018-5:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1234-1236)
02/26/2018-5:00pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 237.
09/25/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-327.
07/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/29/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
06/29/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
02/03/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/31/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/31/2017HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E107)
01/31/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/31/2017 Referred to
07/27/2017 Markup by
09/25/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-327
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/03/2017 Referred to
06/29/2017 Markup by
06/29/2017 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/27/2018 Referred to
12/20/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.767. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (09/25/2017)

Stop, Observe, Ask, and Respond to Health and Wellness Act of 2017 or the SOAR to Health and Wellness Act of 2017

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish a program, to be known as the Stop, Observe, Ask, and Respond to Health and Wellness Training Program or the SOAR to Health and Wellness Training Program, to train health care providers and other related providers to:

  • identify potential human trafficking victims,
  • work with law enforcement to report and facilitate communication with such victims,
  • refer victims to social or victims service agencies or organizations,
  • provide such victims with coordinated care tailored to their circumstances, and
  • consider integrating this training with existing training programs.

The program must include the functions of the training program with the same name that was operating before this bill's enactment and the following initiatives:

  • engaging stakeholders to develop a flexible training module,
  • providing technical assistance to health education programs and health care professional organizations,
  • facilitating the dissemination of best practices, and
  • developing a methodology for collecting and reporting data on the number of human trafficking victims served in health care settings or other related provider settings.

(Sec. 4) HHS must report the number of grantees operating under the program, the number of providers trained through the program, and numbers for the program operating before this program.

(Sec. 5) The bill authorizes appropriations for the program through FY2022.