There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.772. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/31/2017)

Common Sense Nutrition Disclosure Act of 2017

This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to revise the nutritional information that restaurants and retail food establishments must disclose. The nutrient content disclosure statement on the menu or menu board must include: (1) the number of calories contained in the whole menu item; (2) the number of servings and number of calories per serving; or (3) the number of calories per common unit of the item, such as for a multi-serving item that is typically divided before presentation to the consumer. Nutritional information may be provided solely by a remote-access menu (e.g., an Internet menu) for food establishments where the majority of orders are placed by customers who are off-premises.

Establishments with self-serve food may comply with the requirements for restaurants or place signs with nutritional information adjacent to each food item.

An establishment's nutrient content disclosures may vary from actual nutrient content if the disclosures comply with current standards for reasonable basis.

Establishments with standard menu items that come in different flavors, varieties, or combinations, that are listed as a single menu item can determine and disclose nutritional information using specified methods or methods allowed by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA).

Regulations pursuant to this bill or the clause amended by this bill cannot take effect earlier than two years after final regulations are promulgated.

The FDA may not exempt states from nutrition labeling requirements.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/31/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/03/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
01/31/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/31/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Common Sense Nutrition Disclosure Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to improve and clarify certain disclosure requirements for restaurants and similar retail food establishments, and to amend the authority to bring proceedings under section 403A.


Subjects (7)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Consumer affairs
  • Department of Health and Human Services
  • Food industry and services
  • Nutrition and diet
  • Retail and wholesale trades

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 01/31/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/01/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/02/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 02/06/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 02/06/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/06/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/07/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 02/13/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/13/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/14/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 02/14/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/15/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/16/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/27/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 03/02/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 03/02/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 03/02/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/08/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/08/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/13/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/13/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/13/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/13/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 03/16/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/17/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 03/20/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 03/21/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/22/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/27/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/12/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/25/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 04/25/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 04/27/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/27/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 05/16/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/16/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/16/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/18/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/31/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/03/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 05/26/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.772 - Common Sense Nutrition Disclosure Act of 2017.