There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.783. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/01/2017)

Sports Gaming Opportunity Act of 2017

This bill amends the federal judicial code to exempt a lottery, sweepstakes, or other betting, gambling, or wagering scheme authorized by a state by a statute enacted on or after January 1, 2017, and in effect not later than January 1, 2021, from the prohibition against a governmental entity, or a person acting pursuant to the law or compact of a governmental entity, sponsoring, operating, advertising, or promoting sports gambling.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/01/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/02/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: House Judiciary
02/01/2017 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Sports Gaming Opportunity Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend chapter 178 of title 28 of the United States Code to permit during a 4-year period States to enact statutes that exempt from the operation of such chapter, lotteries, sweepstakes, and other betting, gambling, or wagering schemes involving professional and amateur sports.


Subjects (5)

  • Gambling
  • Professional sports
  • School athletics
  • State and local government operations

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/01/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/01/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/02/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 05/26/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.783 - Sports Gaming Opportunity Act of 2017.