There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Employer Participation in Student Loan Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the exclusion for employer-provided educational assistance to employer payments of qualified education loans.

Actions Overview (1)

02/01/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

02/01/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (115)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/01/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/01/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/02/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/17/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/17/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 02/17/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/17/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/17/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/17/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/27/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 02/27/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/06/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/06/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/06/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 03/06/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/06/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 03/08/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/08/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/08/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/08/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/08/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 03/08/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/08/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/16/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/16/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/21/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 03/23/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/23/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/23/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/06/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/06/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/06/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/06/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/06/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/06/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/06/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/28/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/28/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/28/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/28/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/28/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/28/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 04/28/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 04/28/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/28/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/28/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/15/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/15/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/19/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 05/19/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/19/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/19/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/19/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/19/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 05/25/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 05/25/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/25/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/07/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 06/07/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/07/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/22/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/22/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/11/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/11/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/20/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/20/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/20/2017
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 07/20/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 07/20/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/13/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/13/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/13/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 09/13/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/13/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 09/13/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/13/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/27/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 09/27/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/27/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/11/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/11/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/11/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/14/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/14/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 11/14/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 11/29/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/29/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 02/14/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/15/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/15/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/15/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 03/15/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/15/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Employee benefits and pensions
  • Higher education
  • Income tax exclusion
  • Interest, dividends, interest rates
  • Student aid and college costs

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.795. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/01/2017)

Employer Participation in Student Loan Assistance Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend the tax exclusion for employer-provided educational assistance to include payments of qualified education loans by an employer to either an employee or a lender.