There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Drain the Swamp Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to establish a uniform 5-year post-employment ban on the lobbying of any officer or employee of the executive branch or any Member, officer, or employee of Congress by former executive branch officials and former Members, officers, and employees of Congress, to establish a lifetime post-employment ban on lobbying on behalf of foreign governments by former senior executive branch officials, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
03/02/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/01/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/01/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/07/2017
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 06/21/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/01/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice03/02/2017 Referred to
House Administration02/01/2017 Referred to

As of 10/15/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.796 - Drain the Swamp Act of 2017.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.796. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/01/2017)

Drain the Swamp Act of 2017

This bill increases the ban on certain former executive branch officials, Members of Congress, and legislative staff within five years of termination of employment to knowingly make, with the intent to influence, any communication or appearance before an officer or employee of the executive branch, a Member of Congress or their staff, or any other legislative office on behalf of any other person (except the United States). The bill establishes penalties for such violations. The bill eliminates a similar two-year ban on certain senior executive branch officials.

The bill creates a lifetime ban on certain senior personnel of the executive branch (including independent agencies) from representing, aiding, or advising foreign entities.

The bill broadens the definition of lobbying activities in the Lobbying Disclosure Act of 1995 to also include consulting and advising. The bill amends the definition of lobbyist in the Lobbying Disclosure Act of 1995 to include individuals who spend at least 10% of their time engaged in lobbying services to one client in a 3-month period.

The scope of prohibitions on foreign nationals is expanded to include soliciting a contribution or donation in connection with a federal, state, or local election; to a political party; or for an electioneering communication.