There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Resettlement Accountability National Security Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To suspend the admission into the United States of refugees in order to examine the costs of providing benefits to such individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/12/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/03/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/09/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 01/09/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/09/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/09/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 01/09/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/09/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/09/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/09/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/09/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/09/2017
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/09/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/09/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/09/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/09/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 01/09/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/09/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/09/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 01/09/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/09/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 01/09/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/09/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 01/09/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/09/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 01/09/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 01/09/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 01/09/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/09/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 01/09/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/09/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/11/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/11/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 01/11/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 01/11/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/11/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 01/11/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/11/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/11/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/11/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 01/11/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 01/11/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/13/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/13/2017
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 01/13/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/13/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/13/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/13/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/13/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/13/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 01/23/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 01/24/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 01/24/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 01/24/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 01/24/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 01/24/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 01/27/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 01/27/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/31/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/02/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 02/14/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 02/21/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 03/24/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 06/07/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 10/11/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security01/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.80. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Resettlement Accountability National Security Act of 2017

This bill prohibits the admission of alien refugees into the United States unless Congress passes a joint resolution giving the Department of Homeland Security authority to resume admitting them.

The Government Accountability Office shall report on: (1) the national security impact of refugee admissions; and (2) specified costs of providing refugees with benefits under Medicare, Medicaid, disability insurance under title II of the Social Security Act, the supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP, formerly the food stamp program), and low income rental housing assistance.