There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

End Surprise Billing Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to prevent surprise billing practices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
02/14/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/03/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/02/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/15/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/15/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/01/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/01/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/16/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/19/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/19/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/19/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/20/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 11/28/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 01/20/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/17/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/25/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/02/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/14/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/02/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/03/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.817. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/2017)

End Surprise Billing Act of 2017

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to require a critical access hospital or other hospital to comply, as a condition of participation in Medicare, with certain requirements related to billing for out-of-network services.

With respect to an individual who has health benefits coverage and is seeking services, a hospital must provide notice as to: (1) whether the hospital, or any of the providers furnishing services to the individual at the hospital, is not within the health care provider network or otherwise a participating provider with respect to the individual's health care coverage; and (2) if so, the estimated out-of-pocket costs of the services to the individual. At least 24 hours prior to providing those services, the hospital must document that the individual: (1) has been provided with the required notice, and (2) consents to be furnished with the services and charged an amount approximate to the estimate provided. Otherwise, the hospital may not charge the individual more than the individual would have been required to pay if the services had been furnished by an in-network or participating provider.

With respect to such an individual who is seeking same-day emergency services, a hospital may not charge more than the individual would be required to pay for such services furnished by an in-network or participating provider.