There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Tax Credit Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the child credit for children under the age of 6, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/02/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (113)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/02/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/02/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/06/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/06/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/06/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 02/06/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/06/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/06/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/06/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/06/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2017
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/06/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/06/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/06/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/06/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/06/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/14/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/14/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 02/14/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 02/14/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/14/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/14/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/14/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/14/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/14/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/14/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/14/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/16/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 02/16/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/16/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/16/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/16/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/16/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/16/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/16/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/16/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/16/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/16/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/01/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/01/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 03/01/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 03/07/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/10/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/17/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 05/18/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/18/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/18/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/18/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/18/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/18/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/18/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/19/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 05/19/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/19/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/19/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/23/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/23/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/24/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/25/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/22/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/24/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 07/27/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/28/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 10/03/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/04/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 10/04/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/04/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/04/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 10/04/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 10/04/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 10/06/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/06/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/06/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/06/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/06/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/06/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/06/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/12/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/12/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/24/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/25/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 02/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/02/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.821.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.821. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/2017)

Child Tax Credit Improvement Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the child tax credit, to: (1) allow taxpayers an increased $3,600 tax credit for each young child under the age of six (young child tax credit), subject to specified limitations based on adjusted gross income; (2) require the Department of the Treasury to establish a program to make advance payments of the young child tax credit; (3) modify the refundable portion of the child tax credit; and (4) require annual inflation adjustments for both the child tax credit and the young child tax credit.