There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Farm Regulatory Certainty Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Solid Waste Disposal Act to incentivize efficient nutrient management practices and to clarify the citizen suit provisions of such Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E140-141)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 02/16/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 02/16/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 02/16/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 02/16/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/16/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/16/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/10/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 03/10/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/10/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 03/10/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/29/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/29/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 03/29/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 03/29/2017
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/03/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/03/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/03/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/03/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/03/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/22/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/22/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 06/07/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 06/08/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 06/08/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 06/08/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 06/08/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 06/20/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/11/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 08/01/2017
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 09/14/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/10/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/26/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/05/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/03/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment02/10/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.848.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.848. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/2017)

Farm Regulatory Certainty Act

This bill amends the Resources Conservation and Recovery Act of 1976 to specify that animal waste, manure, and fertilizer are excluded from the Act's requirements if the waste, manure, or fertilizer originates from or is utilized by an agricultural operation.

Citizen suits may not be brought under the Act against an agricultural operation if federal or state legal and enforcement actions are already underway.