There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.850. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/2017)

Agency Accountability Act of 2017

This bill requires any agency that receives a fee, fine, penalty, or proceeds from a settlement to deposit the amount in the general fund of the Treasury.

The funds may not be used unless the funding is provided in advance in an appropriations bill. Any amounts deposited during the fiscal year in which this bill is enacted may not be obligated during the fiscal year and must be used for deficit reduction.

The bill includes an exception for funds to be paid to an individual entitled to receive the funds as a whistle-blower, including funds received as a percentage of amounts received by the government pursuant to a judgment or settlement agreement.

The bill amends the Congressional Budget Act of 1974 to require offsetting receipts and collections to be treated as revenue. (Offsetting receipts and collections are funds collected by agencies from other government accounts or from the public in businesslike or market-oriented transactions. Under current law, the collections are treated as negative budget authority and outlays rather than revenue and may be used to offset spending for budget enforcement purposes.)

The requirements of the bill do not apply to the U.S. Postal Service or the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO). The Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and the Director of the USPTO must submit annually to Congress a report describing any fee, fine, penalty, or proceeds from a settlement collected by the USPTO during the previous year.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/03/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/09/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: House Judiciary
02/03/2017 Referred to House Rules
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017 Referred to House Budget
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017 Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017 Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017 Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, the Budget, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Agency Accountability Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To require the appropriation of funds to use a fee, fine, penalty, or proceeds from a settlement received by a Federal agency, and for other purposes.


Subjects (11)

  • Budget deficits and national debt
  • Budget process
  • Civil actions and liability
  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of Commerce
  • Employment discrimination and employee rights
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Intellectual property
  • User charges and fees

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 02/03/2017
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 02/06/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 02/06/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 02/07/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 02/07/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 02/13/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/13/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 02/14/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/16/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/08/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/16/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/18/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 05/22/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/25/2017

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary02/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law03/09/2017 Referred to
House Budget02/03/2017 Referred to
House Rules02/03/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.