There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom of Religion Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide that an alien may not be denied admission or entry to the United States, or other immigration benefits, because of the alien's religion, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/09/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (121)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/03/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/03/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/03/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 02/06/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 02/06/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/06/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 02/06/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/06/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/07/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/09/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 02/13/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/27/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/20/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/20/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/02/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/02/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/03/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/16/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/08/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/13/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/06/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/13/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/09/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/20/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/25/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/28/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/28/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/28/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary02/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/09/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.852.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.852. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/2017)

Freedom of Religion Act of 2017

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide that an alien may not be denied U.S. entry, reentry, or admission, or any other immigration benefit because of the alien's religion or lack of religious beliefs.

Nothing in this bill shall be construed to affect immigration law authority when exercised on a case-by-case basis with respect to an individual who a consular officer, an immigration officer, the Justice Department, the Department of State, the Department of Homeland Security, or the President determines may pose a threat to U.S. national security.