There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Putting Our Veterans Back to Work Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the VOW to Hire Heroes Act of 2011, to provide assistance to small businesses owned by veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
04/25/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
02/24/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/03/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E140)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/03/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity02/06/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services02/03/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/24/2017 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform02/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary02/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/03/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology02/03/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Research and Technology04/25/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.856.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.856. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/2017)

Putting Our Veterans Back to Work Act of 2017

This bill amends the: (1) VOW to Hire Heroes Act of 2011 to extend through 2020 the veterans retraining assistance program, and (2) Wounded Warrior Act to extend through 2020 the authority of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide the same rehabilitation and vocational benefits to members of the Armed Forces with severe injuries or illnesses as are provided to veterans.

The bill extends through: (1) March 31, 2020, additional VA rehabilitation programs for certain disabled veterans who have completed a VA rehabilitation program and have exhausted their rights to state unemployment benefits; and (2) FY2021 the collaborative veterans' training, mentoring, and placement program.

The VA shall develop a single, unified federal web-based employment portal for veterans to access information on federal programs and activities concerning veterans employment, unemployment, and training.

The bill directs the: (1) Department of Homeland Security to award grants to hire veterans as firefighters, and (2) Department of Justice to award grants to hire veterans as law enforcement officers.

The head of each executive and defense agency shall consider favorably, as an evaluation factor in federal solicitations for civilian or defense contracts and task or delivery orders valued at or above $25 million, the employment by a prospective contractor of veterans constituting at least 5% of the contractor's workforce.