There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

California Off-Road Recreation and Conservation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

California Off-Road Recreation and Conservation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

California Desert Protection and Recreation Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for conservation and enhanced recreation activities in the California Desert Conservation Area, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/05/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-416.
06/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5594-5601)
02/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/05/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 722.
12/05/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-416.
10/02/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/25/2018-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/25/2018-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5594-5601)
06/25/2018-4:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 857.
06/25/2018-4:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5594-5603)
06/25/2018-4:08pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/16/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
05/16/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/16/2018HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
05/16/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
02/06/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/03/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/03/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 02/07/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/03/2017 Referred to
05/16/2018 Markup by
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs02/16/2017 Referred to
05/16/2018 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/16/2017 Referred to
02/06/2018 Hearings by
05/16/2018 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/26/2018 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
12/05/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-416

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.857. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/2017)

California Off-Road Recreation and Conservation Act

This bill amends the California Desert Protection Act of 1994 to, among other things:

  • establish or designate wilderness areas, off-highway vehicle recreation areas, and a national scenic area;
  • release specified wilderness study areas;
  • adjust national park and preserve boundaries; and
  • specify land withdrawals and conveyances.

Specified federal land shall be taken into trust for the Lone Pine Paiute-Shoshone Tribe.

Lands and interests in land, including improvements, outside the boundary of Joshua Tree National Park in California, may be acquired for the purpose of operating a visitor center.

The bill makes amendments to the California Desert Protection Act of 1994 regarding the California State School lands.

The bill amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate specified segments of rivers and creeks as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.