There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To terminate the Environmental Protection Agency.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
04/25/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/03/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy02/10/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture02/03/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/03/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/06/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology02/03/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment04/25/2017 Referred to

As of 07/17/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.861 - To terminate the Environmental Protection Agency..


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.861. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/2017)

This bill terminates the Environmental Protection Agency on December 31, 2018.