There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sgt. Brandon Ketchum Never Again Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to ensure that certain veterans receive in-patient psychiatric care provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/06/2017Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 02/06/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 02/06/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/06/2017
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 02/06/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 02/06/2017
Del. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 02/06/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/21/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/21/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/03/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/12/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/12/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 12/20/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 10/30/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs02/06/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/06/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.874.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.874. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2017)

Sgt. Brandon Ketchum Never Again Act

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), upon the request of a veteran who is enrolled in the VA health care system and entitled to in-patient psychiatric care, to furnish such veteran with in-patient psychiatric care at: (1) the VA facility that is closest to where the veteran resides and that has the capacity and capability to provide such care, or (2) at a non-VA facility if the VA facility lacks such capacity or capability.