There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Vietnam Helicopter Crew Monument Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Army to place in Arlington National Cemetery a monument honoring the helicopter pilots and crewmembers who were killed while serving on active duty in the Armed Forces during the Vietnam era, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/24/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 02/06/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 02/06/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 02/06/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/08/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/08/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/27/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/27/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/27/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 03/27/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/04/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/04/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/06/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/19/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/06/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs02/06/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services02/06/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/24/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.877. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2017)

Vietnam Helicopter Crew Monument Act

This bill directs the Department of the Army to place in Arlington National Cemetery a monument honoring helicopter pilots and crew members who were killed while serving on active duty in the Armed Forces during the Vietnam era, subject to an agreement with the Vietnam Helicopter Pilots Association under which the association shall pay all site preparation, construction, installation, and maintenance costs for the memorial.

The Army shall remove the Vietnam Helicopter Pilots Association Memorial Tree and place the monument where the tree stood.